LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSB1155
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1155
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1155
Action History
Senate
03/11/2025
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 604.
Senate
03/10/2025
Subcommittee recommends passage.
Senate
03/07/2025
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2025 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
02/19/2025
Subcommittee: Rowley, Bisignano, and Dawson.
Senate
02/18/2025
Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
Senate
02/18/2025
By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS