Senate | 04/15/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | NOBA: Senate Sub | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/09/2025 3:00PM Lobbyist Lounge. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bousselot and Petersen. H.J. 04/02. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bousselot, and Petersen. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |