LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSB1221
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1221
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1221
Action History
Senate
04/10/2025
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SJR 11.
Senate
04/09/2025
Subcommittee recommends passage.
Senate
04/08/2025
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/09/2025 1:00PM Senate Lounge.
Senate
04/07/2025
Subcommittee: De Witt, Schultz, and Winckler.
Senate
04/03/2025
Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
Senate
04/03/2025
By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS