Senate | 03/06/2025 | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | to Senate | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Title apvd | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Rules Suspended: | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Reported Printed and Referred to Business | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |