House | 03/13/2025 | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2025 Session Law Chapter Effective: | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Delivered to Governor at 8:10 a.m. on March 11, 2025 | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Signed by President; returned to House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | to House | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Title apvd | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Read second time; filed for Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | to Senate | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Rules Suspended: | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |