House | 02/19/2025 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 46-23-1 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |