House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 005-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 005-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|