House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|