House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Fiscal Note Filed | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/05/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |