Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|