House | 06/27/2023 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/05/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |