Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-018-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|