Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|