House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0790
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|