House
|
07/22/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0652
|
|
|
House
|
07/22/2024
|
Effective Date July 19, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|