Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|