House | 04/19/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/05/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |