House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|