Senate
|
12/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|