House | 03/27/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Matt Hanson | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/06/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |