House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0725
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Re-assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|