House
|
08/02/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0411
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|