Senate
|
12/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-014-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|