House
|
07/31/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0405
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-027-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|