House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/19/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |