House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-004-000 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/19/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |