Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2022
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|