House | 05/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/20/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |