House | 02/09/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 12/21/2022 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |