House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0012
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Postponed - Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|