House
|
08/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
08/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|