House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |