House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|