House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|