House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Moved to - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|