House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|