House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0277
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-033-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Labor; 013-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-027-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|