House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |