House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0117
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|