House
|
07/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0118
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|