House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0418
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|