House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|