House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|