House | 05/17/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |