House
|
04/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|