House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |