House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |