House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-005-000 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |