House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|