House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |